Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Pnf Preservation, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Fatima Begum, Rasel Ahmed A K A Jake Ad, represented by Reeves, John Warfield, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Sharon Gianelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal proceeding under New York law filed by PNF Preservation, Inc. against Fatima Begum and Rasel Ahmed (aka "Jake AD"). PNF Preservation, Inc. is a foreign corporation that conducts business in New York, including Nassau County....
AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 01, 2024ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 01, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 19, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: February 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 01, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 07, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 01, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: January 04, 2024ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M-P Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 05, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: November 15, 2023SUMMONS
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) | ||
March 12, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 01, 2024 | AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) | ||
March 01, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) | ||
March 01, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | ||
March 01, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | ||
February 08, 2024 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
February 08, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 07, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
January 25, 2024 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.