Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) Other Matters - Civil Forfeiture case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against Jose M Flores, Peoples Alliance Federal Credit Union, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Anna R Anzalone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna R Anzalone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Civil Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions219 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 15, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) ANNA R. ANZALONE MOTION EFILE 8/6/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
September 04, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) ANNA R. ANZALONE MOTION EFILE 8/6/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 06, 2020 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Before Justice: ANNA R. ANZALONE Answer demanded: Yes Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #001) | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #001) affidavit of service |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #001) affidavit of service |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #001) webcrimins |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.