Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kizzy Belmont, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mills, Michael James, against Nicholas E. Pumilio, Sanitary District No.6, West Hempstead, represented by Janes, Michael Richard, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management253 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 12, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 10, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 10, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Hearing |
DENISE SHER (COMC)
Judge: DENISE L. SHER |
|
October 14, 2020 | Hearing |
EARLY SETTLEMENT CONF HELD DENISE L SHER ADR/ES CONF COMC 12/15/20 Judge: DENISE L. SHER |
|
September 09, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD DENISE SHER (PC PART) Judge: DENISE L. SHER |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verification of J. Michael Cairo to Verified Answer filed on March 3, 2020 |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verification of Nicholas E. Pumilio to Verified Answer filed on March 3, 2020 |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.