Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martha N Mendoza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mushiyev, Yakov, Spektor, Gregory, against Ashok Kumar, Deepak Sharma, represented by Leven, Adrianne Joy, Mcevoy, John Philip, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Mccormack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Certificate of Death Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 01, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 28, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS - PREVIOUSLY MAILED/EMAILED |
||
February 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Fully executed consent to change Attorney |
||
January 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 01, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Certificate of Death Redacted per 22 NYCRR Certificate of Death Redacted |
||
February 01, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 21, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint |
||
January 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.