Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pablo A Colchado, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mushiyev, Yakov, against David Villani, Maryellen Villani, Vanessa Ashley Villani, represented by Asta, John A., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with R. BRUCE COZZENS JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR. BRUCE COZZENS JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management274 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 02, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 04, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 27, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 25, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 07, 2021 | Hearing |
R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (COMC)
Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED R BRUCE COZZENS ADR/ES CONF COMC 01/07/21 Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
October 05, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (MOTION) EFILE 9/4/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
September 30, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (PC PART) Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (FOR PLTF.) (Motion #001) Before Justice: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) Answer demanded: Yes Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.