Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Goldberg, Brian David, against Charlena Bolling, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Fsp-J presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 01, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF 2:00 PM Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-John Doe" (Refused Name) as John Doe #1 |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-CHARLENA BOLLING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.