Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Geico General Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Ametrano, Anthony, Donovan, James Neil, against Ace American Insurance Co., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Arthur Diamond presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeArthur Diamond Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: January 07, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: January 07, 2020PETITION
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 03, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) ARTHUR M. DIAMOND MOTION PART EMAILED 4 HARD COPY 1/7/20 TO AMD Judge: ARTHUR M. DIAMOND |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected* | |
January 07, 2020 | Motion |
CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (Motion #001) Decided: 03/06/2020MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: ARTHUR M. DIAMOND Answer demanded: No Judge: ARTHUR M. DIAMOND |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) *Corrected* | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) PIP Decision |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) NY PIP Rules |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.