Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lancer Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Rogak, Lawrence Neil, against Joanna Kushetsky Pt A A O Dmitry Bender, represented by Sklyut, Olga, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2020SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: December 20, 2019PETITION
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #002) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION EFILED XPETITION,1PG 11/2/2020 TO DPK Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION RERE Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION EFILED XPETITION,1PG 11/2/2020 TO DPK Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 04, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN STATUS AS PER CHAMBERS Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 02, 2020 | Motion |
CROSS-MOTION (OTHER) (Motion #002) Before Justice: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: No Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION RERE Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | |
August 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
July 02, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.