Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Krysal-Lou Irani, Manek Irani, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Naima, Theodore A, against Town Of North Hempstead, represented by Marchan, Selena Krystal, Roopsingh, Neera I., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with THOMAS FEINMAN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management266 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip &Amp; Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 21, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 26, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: March 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 02, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 10, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 08, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 06, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
October 02, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
September 02, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
July 22, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
June 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Answer |
||
June 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) 50H Transcript |
||
June 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.