Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Patricia Finley, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lapp, Ira Harley, Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Antonio Padilla, Ligia Padilla, Paul Padilla, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with JACK L. LIBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Dog Bite) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE |
||
April 01, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
March 31, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
||
March 31, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) NOTICE OF ENTRY WITH ORDER |
||
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) JACK L. LIBERT MOTION PART EFILE 11/9/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: JACK L. LIBERT |
|
November 09, 2020 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Before Justice: JACK L. LIBERT Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JACK L. LIBERT |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - PAUL PADILLA |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WITH PROOF OF MAILING - L. PADILLA |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS WITH PROOF OF MAILING - A PADILLA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.