Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Judith Tubero, Meir Tubero, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Dell, Joseph Gerard, against 35 Mineola Llc, Willis Paint & Design Center, represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, Kern, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 27, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2020REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 17, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2020ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 10, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Hearing |
WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) JAMES P. MCCORMACK (MTN) EFILE 7/13/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) | |
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) JAMES P. MCCORMACK (MTN) EFILE 7/13/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation Adjourn Motion |
|
July 15, 2020 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Decided: 08/27/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: JAMES P. MCCORMACK Answer demanded: No Judge: JAMES P. MCCORMACK |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service and Blue Back |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - Defendants' Letters dated April 3, 2020, May 6, 2020, and June 30, 2020 |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C - Discovery Demands |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.