Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Trustee For Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-7, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Basoglu, Mehmet, Mcgrath, Brian Scott, Newman, Ashley, Spinelli, Victor, against Jane Doe #1-5 Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, John Doe #1-5, Maidenbaum Property Tax Reduction Group, Star Tax Reduction Consultant, Thomas J Lucas, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee for Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-7, against defendants Wyvette Hawkins, Star Tax Reduction Consultant, Thomas J. Lucas, Maidenbaum Property Tax Re...
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE
Date: April 09, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: February 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2024REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 17, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 17, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-C
Date: January 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: October 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE | ||
February 22, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 05, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 05, 2024 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
February 05, 2024 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 17, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF MAILING | ||
January 17, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 17, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-C Exhibits for Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
January 16, 2024 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.