Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The Bay At Dyersburg Health And Rehabilitation Center, Llc, The Bay At Highlands Health And Rehabilitation Center, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Singer, Keith J., against Chaim Leibowitz, David Englander, Tn Dyer Op, Llc, Tn Mem Op, Llc, represented by Hahn, Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Sharon Gianelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Gianelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint, filed by The Bay at Highlands Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC and The Bay at Dyersburg Health and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, alleges breach of contract, conversion, unjust enrichment, and breach of implied covenant of good fait...
ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 16, 2024DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: November 10, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Tennessee DOH Website Excerpt Regarding Applicability Period of Covid Grant |
||
January 16, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Tennessee DOH Website Concerning Covid Funds FAQs |
||
January 16, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Amended Complaint |
||
January 16, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 16, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 11, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Supplemental Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.