Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ingrid M. Wilson, Sacha S. Richards, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Debrosse, Richard A, against Patricia D. Dombroff, Richard J. Dombroff, represented by Pietro, Jaret San, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management332 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: May 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: October 01, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 13, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 25, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 05, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 07, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 07, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Responses to Preliminary Conference Order and So-Ordered Discovery Stipulation |
||
October 07, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendants' Bill of Particulars |
||
September 28, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 14, 2021 | Hearing |
ANTONIO I BRANDVEEN ADR/ESCONF COMC 3/4/21 Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
December 21, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 05, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD ANTONIO I.BRANDVEEN (PC PART) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
October 29, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 29, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED ANTONIO I.BRANDVEEN (PC PART) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.