Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Loiselle, Anna L., against Jairo Pinto A K A Jairo A Pinto, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Randysue Marber presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 27, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: May 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 23, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 23, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: April 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 27, 2023 | Affirmation Of Military Investigation | ||
April 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE |
||
April 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Order granting Judg |
||
April 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Order granting motion |
||
April 27, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
April 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
April 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order Granting Judgment |
||
April 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.