Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bindya Kumar, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Bergman, Michael E, against A & S Vegetables Inc. D B A Maharaja Farmers Market, Guru Teg Holding Inc. D B A Maharaja Farmers Market, Krishna Holding Inc D B A Maharaja Farmers Market, represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management282 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 19, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 26, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: August 18, 2020SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: December 19, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 21, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: October 17, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 26, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 14, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 15, 2020NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
October 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 17, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
July 07, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 13, 2021 | Hearing |
R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (COMC) CHRE Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED R BRUCE COZZENS ADR/ES CONF COMC 01/13/21 Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
October 14, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 16, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (PC PART) 9:30AM Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
September 15, 2020 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed PC Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.