Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rosa Grant, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Silverman, Mark D., against Julian R. Fuquene, represented by Nies, Robert Stephan, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with John Galasso presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management280 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 11, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 18, 2020STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 11, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 29, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 23, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 23, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: August 13, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 24, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
December 02, 2020 | Hearing |
NORMAN ST GEORGE MEDIATION PT ;12:30AM BLOCK TSD Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
November 24, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 14, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JOHN M GALASSO ADR/ES CONF COMC 01/14/21 Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
September 29, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 14, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO (PC PARTS) 9:30AM Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
September 11, 2020 |
STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Proposed Preliminary Conference Stipulation To So Order |
||
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.