Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Luis E. Rivera, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stea, Michael Alexander, Yadgarov, Alex M., against Yvette Gayle, represented by Fillmore, Shannon Elizabeth, Jaber, Ammar Samir, Prusiecki, Jennifer, Wissemann, Hilary Madeline, Zeppieri, Loris, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Catherine Rizzo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: June 16, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 09, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 16, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 02, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 02, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 29, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 15, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 15, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: September 01, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 03, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 03, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 03, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 15, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #004) No show IME letter and invoice for 03/23/22 missed IME |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) PC Order |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) BOP |
||
February 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #004) No show IME letter and invoice for 07/22/21 missed IME |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #004) No show IME letter and invoice for 06/09/21 missed IME |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) EBT transcript of plaintif Rivera |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) S&C |
||
February 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #004) NOI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.