Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) Other Matters - Civil Forfeiture case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against Daimler Title Company, Daimler Trust, Steven R Todd, represented by Meola, Rudolph J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Anna R Anzalone presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Civil Forfeiture |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time14 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 11, 2019STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 18, 2019 | Hearing |
DEFT OPP WITHDRAWN/INACTIVE ANNA R. ANZALONE (HEARING) Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER krimstock 12/18/19 |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.