Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gary Rosen, Rosen Law Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rosen, Gary S, Rosen, Jared Michael, against Ebrahim Shokrian, Mehran Malekan, Shahram Mobasser, represented by Emouna, Matin, Ghaffari, Farimah Shahbazi, Goidel, Jonathan M., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Jack Libert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack Libert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Fraud And Defamation) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: December 18, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) seq 1,2 |
|
January 27, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) JACK L. LIBERT MOTION PART AMENDED NOT MTN 1PG 12-20-19 TO JLL Judge: JACK L. LIBERT |
|
January 27, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) JACK L. LIBERT MOTION PART EFILE NOT MOTION 2PG 12/18/19 TO JLL Judge: JACK L. LIBERT |
|
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #002) Page 33 of offering plan |
|
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) OFFERING PLAN |
|
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) OPINION LETTER |
|
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
January 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.