Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Maria E. Osorio v. Ismael D. Ayala-Amaya, Darryl S. Dowers
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 26, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Maria E. Osorio, is suing the defendants, Ismael D. Ayala-Amaya and Darryl S. Dowers. The complaint alleges that on December …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Nov 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: Oct 17, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 26, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Complaint, Demand for BP, EBT Notice, Combined Demands, etc. |
||
November 06, 2023 |
ANSWER Amended Notice of Insurance Disclosure |
||
October 26, 2023 | Affidavit of Service- Darryl S. Dowers | ||
October 26, 2023 | Affidavit of Service-Ismael D. Ayala-Amaya | ||
October 17, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 26, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |