Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Doloresse Joseph, Guerson Vincent, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Umansky, Alex, against Alice Martinez, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Junior Senatus Point Du Jour, represented by Flores, John Cavin, Giordano, Louis Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiffs, Doloresse Joseph and Guerson Vincent, are residents of Essex County, New Jersey. The defendants named in the complaint are Junior Senatus Point ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 09, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 28, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer and Combined Discovery Demands |
||
September 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
September 13, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.