Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Revenued Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Theodore J, against Active Home Care Services, Inc, Shadrack Bampebuye, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, REVENUED LLC, is suing ACTIVE HOME CARE SERVICES, INC and SHADRACK BAMPEBUYE (referred to as "Defendants") for breach of contract and breach of g...
AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 30, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION In Support |
||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Proof of Funding |
||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Balance Sheet |
||
November 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement |
||
November 30, 2023 | Affidavit of Default | ||
November 30, 2023 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) includes cost |
||
November 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SHADRACK BAMPEBUYE is not in the Armed Services |
||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Notice was mailed to SHADRACK BAMPEBUYE |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHADRACK BAMPEBUYE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.