Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Green Note Capital Partners Spv Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Alphamotive Motors, Llc D B A Alphamotive Motors, Byron P Castro, Jean Pierre W Castro, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, by Green Note Capital Partners SPV LLC against Alphamotive Motors, LLC d/b/a Alphamotive Motors, Byron P Castro, and Jean Pierre W Castro. The complaint alleges...
JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 06, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 06, 2023 | Affirmation of Non Military | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
November 06, 2023 | Affirmation of Second Mailing | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Merchant Agreement Redacted |
||
November 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.