Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Holler, Nicole Elizabeth, against Ace Med Supplies Inc., Adony Cerrato-Villaderes A K A Adony F Cerrato Valladares A K A Adony Cerrato, All City Family Healthcare Center, Inc., Bmm Life Essential Services Inc., Centurion Midtown Medical, Pllc, (total of 42) See All represented by Besso, Ian Alexander, Field, Melissa H, Ghazarian, Krikor, Landsberg, Simon Benjamin, Rybak, Oleg, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Nassau County Clerk's office on September 13, 2023. The plaintiff in this case is Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. The defendants named in the complaint include Kevin S Vasquez Chacon, Vivian Arita Fuentes, Adon...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 27, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 21, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE VIVIAN ARITA FUENTES AKA VIVIAN F ARITA FUENTES AKA VIVIAN FUENTES AKA ARITA GISELLE |
||
December 12, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) 614797.2023 STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE & WAIVER - MEDICAL MRI P.C. (X-8427) |
||
December 10, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIMOTHY J HENDERSON, M.D. |
||
December 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DR MANASHEROV MEDICAL PC |
||
December 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for D&I, Demand for EBTs, Demand for Witness Disc/Exp. Witness Disclosure |
||
December 01, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 31, 2023 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE BCL Service |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE PULSE MED SUPPLY CORP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.