Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cintas Corporation No. 2 D B A Cintas Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sacco, Joseph P., Zinner, Brett David, against Kd Kosher Inc. D B A King David, represented by Rosen, Gene W, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Sarika Kapoor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: July 01, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 28, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: July 07, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Summons-Complaint |
||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Agreement |
||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Signed Invoices |
||
August 15, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Process Server AOS |
||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notice of Motion AOS |
||
August 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Notice of Entry with AOS |
||
August 02, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Arthur Shakarov |
||
August 02, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.