Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Amir Pinchassi A K A Amir Pinchasi, Elizabeth Ingew-Pinchassi A K A Elizabeth Ingew-Pinchasi, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Desai, Rickin, against Durgun Home Improvement Corp., represented by Catanzaro, Leonard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Catherine Rizzo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Mechanic'S Lien |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeLiens |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a verified petition filed by Amir Pinchassi and Elizabeth Ingew-Pinchassi against Durgun Home Improvement Corp. The petitioners are the fee simple owners of a single-family dwelling located at 41 Hawthorne Lane, Great Neck, New York...
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 05, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected*
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023PETITION
Date: September 05, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) STIPULATION WITHDRAWING PETITION |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) STIPULATION ADJOURNING PETITION FIRST TIME ON |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Filled in Exhibit B - Notice Under Section 59 of New York Lien Law |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (AMENDED) (Motion #1) | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Attorney Affirmation |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected* Request for Judicial Intervention |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PETITION Verified Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.