Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sunrise Plaza Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Xue, Benjamin B., against Dejon Lewis Enterprise Inc., Ernest Bartels, Future Group Consulting Inc., Michael Chiarella, Sean Bristol, (total of 6) See All represented by Cutler, Timothy Richard, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Sunrise Plaza LLC, is suing defendants Dejon Lewis Enterprise Inc., Future Group Consulting Inc., Sean Bristol, Ernest Bartels, Michael Chiarella...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claims |
||
October 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MICHAEL CHIARELLA |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DEJON LEWIS ENTERPRISE INC. |
||
October 10, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FUTURE GROUP CONSULTING, INC. |
||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE TIMOTHY R. CUTLER |
||
October 02, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SEAN BRISTOL |
||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.