Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
B G An Infant By Her P/N/G DALINDA MONES and JOSEPH GEBHARDT, Dalinda Mones, Joseph Gebhardt v. J M An Infant By His M/N/G JOANNA RODRIGUEZ, Joanna Rodriguez, Ricuarte Silva Agudelo
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Infant Compromise Part Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Infant Compromise Part Judge
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Overview
Causes of Action
1. ON BEHALF OF INFANT-PLAINTIFF B.G. AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS (Negligence)
2. ON BEHALF OF INFANT-PLAINTIFF B.G. AGAINST JOANNA RODRIGUEZ and RICUARTE SILVA ACUDELA (Negligent Entrustment)
3. ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS DALINDA MONES AND JOSEPH GEBHARDT AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS (Loss of Companionship and Society)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiffs in this case are B.G., an infant, represented by her parents and natural guardians Dalinda Mones and Joseph Gebhardt, as well as Dalinda Mone…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Oct 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Oct 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Oct 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Oct 30, 2023RJI -RE: INFANTS COMPROMISE
Date: Oct 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: Oct 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Oct 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Oct 30, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons+Complaint |
||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Ricuarte Affidavit of No Excess |
||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Police accident report |
||
October 30, 2023 | RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE | ||
October 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation in support |
||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Rodriguez Affidavit |
||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Mother's Affidavit |
||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |