Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Green Note Capital Partners Spv Llc v. Three C Exploration, Llc D/B/A THREE C EXPLORATION, Three C Oil & Gas, Llc THREE C OIL & GAS, Mohican Oil & Gas, Llc D/B/A MOHICAN OIL & GAS, Three C Exploration, Llc D/B/A THREE C EXPLORATION, …
An Other Matters - Contract - Other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 26, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Contract - Other
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, by Green Note Capital Partners SPV LLC ("Plaintiff") against Three C Exploration, LLC d/b/a Three C Exploration; Three C Oil & Gas, LLC d/b/a Three C Oil & …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Nov 15, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Nov 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Nov 06, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Nov 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Nov 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: Nov 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redactedper 22 NYCRR
Date: Sep 05, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 05, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 13, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 06, 2023 | Affirmation of Non Military | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
November 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 06, 2023 | Affirmation of Second Mailing | ||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
||
November 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Merchant Agreement Redacted |
||
November 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 19, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted |
||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |