Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Green Valley, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against 718 Management Group, Llc D B A 718 Management Group, Aleksandr Rabkin, Bsaxfl, Llc D B A Bsaxfl, Vsyd, Llc D B A Vsyd, represented by Chechelnitsky, Yana, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Sarika Kapoor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, by the plaintiff, Green Valley, against the defendants, VSYD, LLC D/B/A VSYD; 718 MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC D/B/A 718 MANAGEMENT GROUP; BSAXFL, LLC D/B/A BSAXFL; and...
INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Merchant Agreement
Date: October 25, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Merchant Agreement
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 03, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT
Date: September 05, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: May 06, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: April 15, 2024NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Proof of Funding
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Merchant Agreement Merchant Agreement Redacted |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint and Answer |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Client Affidavit |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Proof of Funding Proof of Funding Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.