Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anthony J. Sorrentino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goldrick, William Matthew, against Timothy P. Carroll, represented by Weakland, Shawn Michael, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Anthony J. Sorrentino, is suing the defendant, Timothy P. Carroll, for a motor vehicle collision that occurred on March 18, 2023....
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: December 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
||
December 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 18, 2023 | NOTICE TO ADMIT | ||
December 15, 2023 | Demand for Bill of Particulars and Combined Demands | ||
December 15, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 24, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.