Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by , against Marlon Derosena, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 08, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 31, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: November 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 05, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified |
||
November 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Verified Complaint |
||
November 15, 2023 |
COMPLAINT Verified |
||
November 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) and demand |
||
September 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Summons with Notice |
||
August 31, 2023 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE | ||
August 31, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
August 31, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.