Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nicholas James Ryan v. Elizabeth S. Lustrin M.D., Christopher R. Wilkins M.D., Bhumika Balgobin M.D., Marlon Seliger M.D., Ajay K. Misra M.D., Suchismita Datta M.D., Nyu Langone Radiology Associates, Nyu Langone Ambulatory Care East Meadow, Advanced…
A Torts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 28, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Category
Torts - Medical, Dental, or Podiatrist Malpractice
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Nicholas James Ryan, is suing multiple defendants, including Elizabeth S. Lustrin, M.D., Christopher R. Wilkins, M.D., Bhumik…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: Jan 04, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: Jan 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Nov 24, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: Nov 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Nov 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: Nov 01, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 15, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE TT Notice of Medical Malpractice |
||
January 04, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
November 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AJAY K. MISRA, M.D. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: COMBINED DISCOVERY DEMANDS |
||
November 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Datta |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Suchismita Datta, M.D. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-NYU Langone Hospitals s/h/a NYU Langone Hospital Long Island f/k/a NYU Win DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-NYU Langone Hospitals s/h/a NYU Langone Hospital Long Island f/k/a NYU Win ... show more |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-NYU Langone Hospitals s/h/a NYU Langone Hospital Long Island f/k/a NYU Winthrop Hos VERIFIED ANSWER-NYU Langone Hospitals s/h/a NYU Langone Hospital Long Island f/k/a NYU Winthrop Hos ... show more |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Seliger |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Marlon Seliger, M.D., |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Lustrin |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Christopher Wilkins, M.D. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Elizabeth S. Lustrin, M.D. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Bhumika Balgobin, M.D. |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Wilkins |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Balgobin |
||
November 01, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR A VERIFIED BP-Dr. Misra |
||
November 01, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER-Ajay K. Misra, M.D |
||
October 05, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer |
||
September 26, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AJAY K. MISRA, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BHUMIKA BALGOBIN, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MARLON SELIGER, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYU LANGONE HEALTH SYSTEM |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYU LANGONE AMBULATORY CARE EAST MEADOW |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUCHISMITA DATTA, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADVANCED NEUROLOGICAL SERVICES OF LONG ISLAND, P.C. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYU LANGONE RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYU LANGONE HOSPITAL - LONG ISLAND F/K/A NYU WINTHROP HOSPITAL |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHRISTOPHER R. WILKINS, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ELIZABETH S. LUSTRIN, M.D. |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYU EMERGENCY MEDICINE |
||
August 31, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT with Certificate of Merit CPLR 3012(a) |