Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Joseph J. Sarcona Jr., Joseph J. Sarcona Jr. Counterclaim Def, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Ettenger, Jeffrey Scott, Schwartz, Lee Allen, against Cathy Siegler Additional Counterclaim Defendant, Christian T. Sarcona Additional Counterclaim Defendant, Frank R. Licausi Additional Counterclaim Defendant, Jeffrey Bravo Additional Counterclaim Defendant, Jfm Logistics Management, Inc., (total of 13) See All represented by Abrams Fensterman Llp, Bank, Brian Laurence, Corso, Keith Wilson, Feldman, Joshua, Gionis, John H., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Jerome C. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Joseph J. Sarcona Jr., is suing in the right of JJS Transportation and Distribution Co., Inc., as well as individually. The defen...
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE *Corrected*
Date: November 23, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 23, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2022OATH
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: September 01, 2022BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: August 25, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: May 31, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: August 25, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 22, 2022BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: September 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 30, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 22, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: August 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 16, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 28, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 23, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 14, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2022EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: April 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: April 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 31, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: June 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) January 2022 LOC Statement - Redacted
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002) Information Subpoena
Date: February 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) Email dated September 8, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002) LOC Note - Redacted
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1) Email dated November 2, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1) Chase LOC Paydown Receipt
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) Email dated October 11, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: February 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: January 31, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) Email dated October 12, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Email dated October 13, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Email dated September 29, 2021
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: November 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: February 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 03, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 27, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 22, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: December 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 16, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 14, 2022TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #012) *Corrected*
Date: April 19, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: April 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 03, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 03, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: April 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010) *Corrected*
Date: March 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 29, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 15, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #010) *Corrected*
Date: March 29, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 07, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009) *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 07, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: February 07, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: April 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 12, 2023TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 24, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 05, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 11, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #8)
Date: November 15, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 18, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 30, 2023STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 29, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: April 19, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #012) Decision and Order |
||
April 19, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #012) Affirmation in Support to Amend Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #012) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #012) Answer to Amended Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #012) Answer to Original Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #012) Amended Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #012) Original Complaint |
||
April 19, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #012) Third Amended Complaint |
||
April 18, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #010) Exhibit C (Notice of Bankruptcy Filing) |
||
April 18, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #010) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.