Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hof I Grantor Trust 5,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Deutsch, Joshua, Fielding, William James, Goldberg, Brian Matthew, against Deedee Doe Last Name Refused, Deedef Doe Last Name Refused, John Doe 1-10, Legacy Inv. & Management Group, Llc, Nelson Hernandez, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Nassau Fp3 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp3 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 18, 2020EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 09, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 02, 2020NOTICE OF SALE
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 03, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 09, 2021REQUEST TO FILE NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 04, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: March 03, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 03, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 09, 2021ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 09, 2021AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 02, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 27, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: March 27, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 12, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: March 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 29, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
September 04, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
August 02, 2023 |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #2) Request on Consent to Adjourn Motion Seq. 2 |
||
August 02, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST | ||
August 02, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Request to Mark off or in alternative adjourn Motion Seq. #3 |
||
July 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Summons and complaint |
||
July 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
July 26, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) of cross-motion and in opposition to motion |
||
July 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.