Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Refael Klein, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kendall, Glen Alan, Kerr, William B, against Catholic Health System Of Long Island, Inc., represented by Barbiero, Anthony Francis, Dantonio, Thomas S, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Sarika Kapoor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Breach Of Confidentiality) |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 23, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: January 27, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Verified Amended Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 20, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2022 | Notice of Entry, on 7-29-22, of Justice Pineda-Kirwan's 7-26-22 Order of Dismissal | ||
July 29, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 28, 2022 | Notice of Entry, on 7-27-22, of Justice Pineda-Kirwan's 7-26-22 Order of Dismissal | ||
March 16, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Healthix Privacy Policy |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit of Refael Klein |
||
March 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Attorney Affirmation of Glen A. Kendall |
||
March 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Screenshots of Healthix Report |
||
March 10, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.