Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee For Novastar Mortgage Funding Trust, Series 2006-4 Novastar Home Equity Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Alice Rodriguez, John Doe One Through John Doe Twelve The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint, Karyn Lein, Leike Huang, Lin Sheng, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time134 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 10, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Atty affirmation to cancel NOP |
||
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS ALICE RODRIGUEZ |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS MIN DU 35 N RAYMOND AVENUE UNIT 409 PASSADENA CA |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS NAOMI ALVAREZ |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NO DOE AFFIDAVIT |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM 3215 NAOIMI ALVAREZ |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM OCCUPANT |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.