Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ebra 70 Pine Master Tenant Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Maidenbaum, Jeffrey A, against Caleb Denis, Lea Denis, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions252 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time253 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: June 10, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 18, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION non military on Lea Denis |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION non military on Caleb Denis |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION additional mailing on Lea Denis |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION additional mailing on Caleb Denis |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of facts |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served def #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.