Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rael Automatic Sprinkler Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bizzaro, Thomas Andrew, Dileonardo, Diana Patricia, Peters, George William, against Slow Food Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Thomas Feinman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions270 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time268 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT *Corrected*
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 26, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 04, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: January 29, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 29, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment with Notice of Entry |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT *Corrected* Notice of Settlement with Proposed Judgment |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.