Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Howard Zelin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beal, Kenneth Ira, against Karima Noory, Naqib Noory, represented by Flores, John Cavin, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Sarika Kapoor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarika Kapoor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Stip & Order |
||
April 10, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 20, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 23, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
November 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Naqib Noory |
||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Karima Noory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.