Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Howard Zelin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beal, Kenneth Ira, against Karima Noory, Naqib Noory, represented by Flores, John Cavin, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Sarika Kapoor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarika Kapoor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Stip & Order |
||
April 10, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 20, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 23, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
November 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Naqib Noory |
||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Karima Noory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.