Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
David Borukhov, Stella Kandova, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kariyeva, Michelle, Levitsky, Dmitry, Roth, Ronald H., against Daniel Christopher Simmons, Friendship Engine And Hose Company, Inc., represented by Maloney, Stephen Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Helen Voutsinas presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management346 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: November 01, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 13, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 14, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 29, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 14, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 02, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 04, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 24, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #2) Exhibit 4 - First Notice for D&I |
||
November 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #3) Exhibit 6 - Stip. of Discontinuance dated 08/05/2021 |
||
November 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
November 23, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected* Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
November 22, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 08, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affirmation of Service of OTSC ("Motion #3") |
||
November 02, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 29, 2021 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.