Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Daniel Alibayof, Ronny Alibayof v. Jocalio Group Llc, Val Katayev
On September 12, 2019 a commercial division case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Sharon Gianelli presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 12, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial Division
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
2. AGAINST BOTH DEFENDANTS (Breach of fiduciary duty)
3. AGAINST BOTH DEFENDANTS
110URTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST BOTH DEFENDANTS (Breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing)
Cause of Action.
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 30, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: Mar 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: Mar 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Feb 27, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Dec 08, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: Nov 17, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Nov 17, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 12, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: Nov 29, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: Sep 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jul 15, 2021DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Jul 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 002)
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: May 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Apr 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 002)
Date: Apr 30, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Apr 30, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - E
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - F
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Apr 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Apr 09, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: Mar 10, 2020ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION
Date: Mar 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: Jan 15, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 08, 2020STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Dec 13, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Dec 12, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: Nov 20, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 07, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 07, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 07, 2019AFFIRMATION (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 07, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: Nov 07, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: Oct 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 20, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 12, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
March 27, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
March 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Co-counsel appearance |
||
December 08, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Extension of Discovery Deadlines Stip and Order |
||
November 17, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 12, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
April 12, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 29, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
September 20, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 14, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service of Affirmation in Opposition |
||
May 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Stuart L. Sanders, Esq., in opposition to motion |
||
May 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Letter e-filed on April 12, 2021 |
||
April 30, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
April 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Copies of revised responses and objections |
||
April 30, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Copies of Plaintiffs responses and objections |
||
April 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 12, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Response to letter dated April 9, 2021 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Letter dated April 7, 2021 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Letter dated October 26, 2020 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Letter dated March 11, 2021 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter dated September 4, 2020 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F E-mail dated December 30, 2020 |
||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Letter dated August 28, 2020 |
||
April 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of Spectrum Blue Parties' revised responses and objections |
||
April 09, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Motion to Compel Pursuant to Commercial Division Rule 14 |
||
April 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Copies of the Roxx Alison Parties responses and objections |
||
December 11, 2020 | hearing |
VITO M\. DESTEFANO (COURT PT)
Judge: VITO M. DESTEFANO |
|
October 21, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (COURT PART) 2:30 PM Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
October 21, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED VITO M\. DESTEFANO (COURT PT) Judge: VITO M. DESTEFANO |
|
September 09, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (COMC) Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (COMC) Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
May 06, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (COMC) Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ADR - ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION | |
March 04, 2020 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (PC PART) Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 13, 2020 | hearing |
WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (MOTION PT) EFILE NOT MOTION 2PG 11/8/19 TO SAB Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Discontinuance against defendant, Val Katayev only |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
November 26, 2019 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA (MOTION PT) EFILE NOT MOTION 2PG 11/8/19 TO SAB Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | |
November 08, 2019 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Decided: 01/13/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: STEPHEN A\. BUCARIA Answer demanded: Yes Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) to Dismiss |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) of Motion to Dismiss |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verified Complaint |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) of Howard B. Kleinberg |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of service upon Val Katayev |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT summons and verified complaint |