Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Commercial Fire & Security, Inc., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Gallub, Alison S., against Rosa Gambino, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time66 days |
PETITION
Date: September 09, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 09, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: October 04, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 14, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) CALENDAR CLERK DEPT STIP/STLMT 11/14/19 Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
November 14, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION EFILED AMEND MOTION 10/7/19 TO DPK,2PGS Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
October 07, 2019 | Motion |
CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (Motion #001) Decided: 11/14/2019MOTION DECIDED Before Justice: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: No Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) | |
October 03, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION EFILE NOT PET 2PG 9/10/19 TO DPK Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
October 02, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION EFILE NOT PET 2PG 9/10/19 TO DPK Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Arbitration Rule Page |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.