Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Kenkaide T. Douglas, Tina Douglas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ervin, Howard, against Julie K. Kalimian, Morad D. Kalimian, represented by Aloia, John Luke, Dahlgren, Eric Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Erica L Prager presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: November 15, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 17, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 20, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 28, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 09, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 28, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 23, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
February 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2021 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
June 17, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
April 28, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
January 20, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
JACK L. LIBERT (PC PART)
Judge: JACK L. LIBERT |
|
November 23, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 16, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 09, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.