Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) Other Matters - Civil Forfeiture case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against One Main Financial Group A K A Onemain Holdings Inc, One Main Financial Group A K A Onemain Holdings Inc, Richard Cirillo, represented by Sussman, David Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with David P Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid P Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Civil Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 21, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: November 05, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
November 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 21, 2021 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service upon OneMain Financial Group LLC |
||
October 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service upon Richard Cirillo |
||
October 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 23, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER krimstock 10/6/21 |
||
September 23, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.