Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gloria Del Carmen Cabrera, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Alfisi, Mark Anthony, Chan, Nicole Chealisse, Young, Gary Jay, against Petco Health And Wellness Company Inc, Petsta Llc, Staples Inc, represented by Barbieri, John V, Clinton, Kevin Daniel, Macias, Jacklyn Marie, Risi, John A., Smitelli, Janet Heller, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDenise Sher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 08, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 01, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 10, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 27, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 25, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 27, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 30, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 10, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 08, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 22, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 22, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
February 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO PETSTA JUNE 15, 2022 D&I |
||
February 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S Post EBT Demands |
||
February 08, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 13, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Dentco Inc.'s Affirmation in Partial Support and Partial Opposition |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Action No. 2's Aff of Service of TPC |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) eLaw Appearances |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) eLaw Case Details |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) RJI rejection email |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Action No. 2's Third Party Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.