Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Emerald Group Holdings Llc D B A Vitalcap Fund, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feldman, Yosef Chaim, Klestzick, Yonatan Y., against Mark Levitt D B A Mark Levit Electric, Mark Ross Levitt, represented by Dale, Dominick R., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Pay Run Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Funding Confirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B Fox v RPP |
||
October 16, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A Novac Entities v Coronam Auto Repair |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 16, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff Affidavit |
||
July 31, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 31, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) MOTION TO DISMISS |
||
July 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Additional Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.