Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fundfi Merchant Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fogel, David, against Micheal Jerome Durant, M.J.D Network Llc, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Dawn Jimenez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 22, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 22, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Attorney Affirmation |
||
February 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Affirmation of Service for OSC on Deft |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #002) Contract Redacted |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #002) Non-Military Search |
||
February 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Signed OSC |
||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Service on all defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.